West v. Palo Alto Housing Corporation et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Lucy H Koh |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00238 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2017 2:27 AM PDT |
Defendant
Alma Place Associates LP (Owners)
|
|
Defendant
April Fields
|
|
Defendant
Candice Gonzales
|
|
Defendant
Jocelyn Harrison
|
|
Defendant
Georgia Mascarendas
|
|
Defendant
PAHC Apartments Inc.
|
|
Defendant
PAHC Management and Services Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Palo Alto Housing Corporation
|
|
Defendant
James Quinn
|
|
Defendant
Evangeline Granadosin
|
|
Plaintiff
James West
PO Box 15251
San Francisco, CA 94115 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Vangie Mascarenhas
Terminated: 05/09/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, October 19, 2022 | ||
246 | 246
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 10/19 11:46 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to228 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by James West. The judgment of this Court, entered June 15, 2022, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure (bw, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2022 | ||
245 | 245
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 10/12 3:34 PM
ORDER of USCA as to228 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by James West (hdj, COURT STAFF) |