Atlanta Vietop Media, LLC
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Jeffery W Cavender |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-50958 |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2020 |
Debtor
Atlanta Vietop Media, LLC
5495 Jimmy Carter Blvd Ste C2
Norcross, GA 30093-1514 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Kyle A. Cooper
Kyle A. Cooper, Trustee Suite 102 615 Colonial Park Drive
Roswell, GA 30075 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
362 Richard Russell Building 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW
Atlanta, GA 30303 |
Docket last updated: 01/19/2017 12:02 AM EST |
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Wed 01/18 2:33 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) for Non-Individual Fee $ 335, Filed by Charles M. Clapp of Law Offices of Charles Clapp, LLC on behalf of Atlanta Vietop Media, LLC. Government Proof of Claim due by 7/17/2017. (Clapp, Charles) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Autodocket of Credit Card
Wed 01/18 2:44 PM
Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-50958 [misc,1011aty] ( 335.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 43823048. Fee Amount 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
misc
03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7 - Corporation - No Asset)
Wed 01/18 3:32 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7 - Corporation - No Asset). 341 Meeting to be held on 02/22/2017 at 03:00 PM at Hearing Room 366, Atlanta. (Admin.) |