Johnson v. Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edmund A Sargus |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00055 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 18, 2017 |
Petitioner
William Johnson Jr.
|
|
Respondent
Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 02/01 4:53 PM
ORDER of USCA It is therefore ORDERED that this cause be, and it hereby is, dismissed for want of prosecution as to14 Notice of Appeal filed by William Johnson, Jr. Note: No Mandate to issue . (pb) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Mon 12/04 3:02 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: On 10/18/17 Judgment was entered dismissing this petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Petitioner has filed a Notice of Appeal, which the Court construes as a request for a certificate of appealability14 and Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis15 . The Petitioner's request for a certificate of appealability is denied. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis is denied, as the Court certifies that an appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/04/2017. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
USCA Case Number
Fri 12/01 2:23 PM
USCA Case Number 17-4240 for14 Notice of Appeal filed by William Johnson, Jr.; case manager Jill Colyer, 513-564-7024. (er) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Wed 11/22 3:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Petitioner William Johnson, Jr. (kpt) |
|
14 | 14
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 11/22 3:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL re12 OPINION AND ORDER and13 JUDGMENT, (IFP Pending) by Petitioner William Johnson, Jr. (kpt) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 10/18 10:41 AM
JUDGMENT is entered pursuant to the Opinion and Order filed 10/18/2017. This case is CLOSED. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Wed 10/18 10:37 AM
OPINION AND ORDER adopting10 the Magistrate Judge's 10/04/2017 Report and Recommendation and overruling11 the Petitioner's Objection to the Report and Recommendation. This Court concludes that Petitioner has failed to establish he is entitled to relief and this action is DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/18/2017. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Mon 10/16 1:07 PM
OBJECTION to10 Report and Recommendations by Petitioner William Johnson, Jr. (er) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 10/04 1:38 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS dismissing1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Objections to R&R due by 10/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/4/2017. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Reply to Respondent's Answer (Traverse)
Mon 05/15 10:02 AM
REPLY (Traverse) to8 Respondent's Return of Writ (Answer) filed by Petitioner William Johnson, Jr. (sem) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Return of Writ (Answer)
Mon 05/08 5:24 PM
RETURN of Writ by Respondent Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution. (Lamb, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-28, | ||
Att: 2 Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. 1, | ||
Att: 3 Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. 2, | ||
Att: 4 Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. 3, | ||
Att: 5 Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. 4 | ||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/24 12:43 PM
ORDER granting in part6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court finds good cause exists to justify a thirty-day extension, rather than a sixty-day extension. Petitioner may reply to the response within fifteen (15) days of its filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/24/2017. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 04/21 5:49 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 6/23/2017. to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondent Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution. (Lamb, William) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 03/10 10:04 AM
ORDER granting in part4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution answer due 4/24/2017; Petitioner may reply within fifteen (15) days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/10/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 03/09 3:48 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 5/19/2017. to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondent Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution. (Lamb, William) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 03/01 5:48 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Respondent's Return to the Petition due by 3/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/1/17. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 02/17 2:07 PM
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 46153 (kdp) |
||
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order
Thu 02/09 10:47 AM
ORDER - Petitioner is ORDERED to pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a proper motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/9/2017. (agm)(This document and an application to proceed IFP have been sent by regular mail to the Petitioner.) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 01/18 12:23 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by William Johnson, Jr. (sct) |