|
|
utility
Remark
Wed 02/22 3:08 PM
Certified Copy of Remand Order and Docket Sheet Sent to State Court and to Pro Se Defendant. (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
order
Order
Wed 02/15 3:35 PM
ORDER REMANDING ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/15/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/19 5:17 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Essex Emeryville Owner, L.P... (Rothbard, Todd) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Order
Thu 01/19 12:56 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/19/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) (dl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
(1/19/2017) Certificate/Proof of Service
|
3
|
|
3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 01/18 12:53 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.(alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
|
2
|
|
2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 01/18 12:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Melinda Scott. (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 01/18 12:47 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG16840306. (). Filed byMelinda Scott.(alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|