Estrada v. Commissioner of Social Security
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Maxine M Chesney |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00254 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 01/24 1:53 PM
Amended Application to Proceed In forma Pauperis filed by Martha A Estrada. Responses due by 2/7/2017. Replies due by 2/14/2017. (Safa, Cyrus) (Filed on 1/24/2017) Modified on 1/24/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 01/19 7:42 AM
Electronic filing error. Due to incorrect In Forma Pauperis Application being used at case opening Judge can not be randomly assigned to case at this time. Please file correct IFP Application as soon as possible Re:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Martha A Estrada (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
||
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 01/24 2:14 PM
Case assigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/1/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 01/18 5:19 PM
Proposed Summons. (Safa, Cyrus) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 01/18 5:18 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Martha A Estrada. (Safa, Cyrus) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/18 5:17 PM
COMPLAINT For Review of The Final Decision Of The Social Security against Commissioner of Social Security. Filed byMartha A Estrada.(Safa, Cyrus) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |