Republic of Kazakhstan v. Ketebaev
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Lucy H Koh |
Referred: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00246 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2017 1:51 AM PDT |
Defendant
Muratbek Ketebaev
|
|
Defendant
Ilyas Khrapunov
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Republic of Kazakhstan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
92 | 92
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/08 10:22 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/8/18. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
91 | 91
36
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Transfer Case Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 06/08 10:16 AM
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying 70 Motion to Transfer Case; Granting 75 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
90 | 90
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 06/04 5:04 PM
***CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT AND CONTINUING CMC*** The Motions to Transfer and Dismiss (ECF Nos.70 and75 ) before Judge Lucy H. Koh previously noticed for 6/7/2018 at 1:30 PM have been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 6/7/18 hearings are VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motions. Additionally, the further CMC is HEREBY CONTINUED to 6/27/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) |