Gill Reprographics, Inc. v. Knudson et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00250 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2017 1:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
Golden State Reprographics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Keith Knudson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gill Reprographics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 05/04 11:37 AM
ORDER granting 32 Stipulation OF DISMISSAL. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/4/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 05/03 1:20 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by Gill Reprographics, Inc.. (Ly, Sabrina) (Filed on 5/3/2017) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order
Mon 04/03 3:58 PM
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The hearing on the Order to Show Cause scheduled for 4/6/2017 is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on 5/11/2017. On or before 5/4/2017, the parties shall file an updated joint statement. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/3/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Mon 04/03 3:48 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING SETTLEMENT filed by Gill Reprographics, Inc.. (Ly, Sabrina) (Filed on 4/3/2017) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/03 5:35 PM
***Set Deadlines/Hearings pursuant to ECF31 : Show Cause Response due by 5/4/2017. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/11/2017 10:00 AM. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017) |
||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order
Fri 02/17 11:33 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10:00 a.m. on 4/6/2017. Parties shall file a Joint Statement in response to the Order to Show Cause by 3/30/2017. All deadlines and hearings are VACATED, and any pending motions are TERMINATED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/17/2017. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Settlement
Thu 02/16 3:55 PM
Notice of Settlement filed by Gill Reprographics, Inc.. Responses due by 3/2/2017. Replies due by 3/9/2017. (Ly, Sabrina) (Filed on 2/16/2017) Modified on 2/16/2017 *** under the Civil Category Other Filings - Notice - correct event is Notice of Settlement (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 02/16 4:37 PM
Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:28 MOTION for Settlement *** under the Civil Category Other Filings - Notice - correct event is Notice of Settlement filed by Gill Reprographics, Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017) Modified on 2/16/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Tue 02/07 11:34 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Gill Reprographics, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Steven M. Gill, Other Affiliate Mark C. Gill for Gill Reprographics, Inc.. re1 Complaint (Ly, Sabrina) (Filed on 2/7/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 02/01 3:13 PM
ORDER Granting 25 Joint Stipulation of the Parties Re Rescheduling of TRO Hearing to Next Date Available Beyond 2/16/2017. It is hereby ordered pursuant to stipulation of the parties that the hearing on Plaintiff's Temporary Restraining Order is hereby reset to 3/9/2017 at 9:00 a.m. The hearing scheduled for 2/2/2017 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila 2/1/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 02/01 2:50 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 18 Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, filed by Golden State Reprographics, LLC, Keith Knudson. (Schramm, Richard) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
24 | 24
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 02/01 2:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gill Reprographics, Inc. re12 Notice (Other) of entry of order granting plaintiff's ex parte motion for temporary restraining order, et al. (Ly, Sabrina) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
23 | 23
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 02/01 2:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gill Reprographics, Inc.. Keith Knudson served on 1/24/2015, answer due 2/14/2015. (Ly, Sabrina) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
22 | 22
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 02/01 2:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gill Reprographics, Inc.. Golden State Reprographics, LLC served on 1/20/2017, answer due 2/10/2017. (Ly, Sabrina) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 02/01 3:15 PM
***Reset TRO Hearing pursuant to ECF26 Order: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 3/9/2017 09:00 AM. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
||
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Fri 01/27 5:50 PM
Declaration of Tina Knudson in Support of19 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byGolden State Reprographics, LLC, Keith Knudson. (Schramm, Richard) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
20 | 20
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Fri 01/27 5:49 PM
Declaration of Keith Knudson in Support of19 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byGolden State Reprographics, LLC, Keith Knudson. (Schramm, Richard) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Fri 01/27 5:47 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byGolden State Reprographics, LLC, Keith Knudson. (Schramm, Richard) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 01/26 12:09 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the hearing on plaintiffs Motion for temporary restraining order, ECF No.6 is set for 2/2/2017 at 9:00 am, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Opposition due 1/27/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
17 | 17
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 01/26 10:44 AM
(Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/26 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Richelle Carlson and Richard D. Schramm (Carlson, Amy) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 01/26 8:56 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 1/26/2017.(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
14 | 14
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Thu 01/26 8:41 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 01/25 1:28 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Golden State Reprographics, LLC, Keith Knudson.. (Schramm, Richard) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 01/23 12:31 PM
NOTICE by Gill Reprographics, Inc. re11 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, and granting plaintiff's ex parte motion for TRO, expedited discovery and order to show cause re preliminary injunction (Ly, Sabrina) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion
Fri 01/20 8:47 PM
ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Re: ECF 6 . Hearing set for 1/31/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/20/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
10 | 10
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 01/20 8:40 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/20/2017: Court sets hearing on plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order for 1/31/2017 01:00 PM. Plaintiff's Attorney: Dean Rocco. (FTR Time: 3:16pm - 3:38pm.) This is a text only Minute Entry. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2017) |
|
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Fri 01/20 9:50 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Telephonic Status Conference for 1/20/2017 02:00 PM. Counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at 408.535.5343 to provide a direct dial number. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 01/20 9:12 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gill Reprographics, Inc... (Ly, Sabrina) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Thu 01/19 10:56 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/26/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Ex Parte Application
Thu 01/19 4:55 PM
Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Orders filed by Gill Reprographics, Inc..(Ly, Sabrina) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to the Ex Parte Application, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Mark C. Gills, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 to 16 to Mark Gills' Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 17 to Mark Gills' Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration of Dean Rocco, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/19 2:33 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 01/19 1:47 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2017 10:00 AM at the US District Court, 280 S. First St., San Jose, CA 95113 in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Nathanel Cousins on 1/18/17. (srn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 01/19 12:22 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/2/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 01/18 4:35 PM
Proposed Summons. (Ly, Sabrina) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/18 4:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Golden State Reprographics, LLC, Keith Knudson ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11084171.). Filed byGill Reprographics, Inc..(Ly, Sabrina) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |