Dickerson v. Clark County School District
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00158 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2017 2:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
Clark County School District
Clark County School District 5100 W. Sahara Ave
Las Vegas, NV 89146 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Dickerson
4375 E. Sunset Road, #422
Henderson, NV 89141 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/18 3:00 PM
ORDER Granting20 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/18 9:09 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Defendant Clark County School District. (Greenberg, S.) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/24 3:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting18 Stipulation. (Discovery due by 11/13/2017., Motions due by 12/13/2017., Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/15/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Stipulation re Discovery Matters
Fri 07/21 3:41 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re14 Scheduling Order, ; by Plaintiff Tiffany Dickerson. (Balaban, Michael) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
minord
Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 07/10 6:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 7/10/2017. IT IS ORDERED that a hearing regarding6 MOTION to Dismiss ( is set for August 22, 2017 at 4:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. A hearing is for August 22, 2017. Counsel for the parties are ordered to appear at this hearing. Failure to appear at the scheduled hearing time may result in the imposition of sanctions, including but not limited to monetary sanctions, granting of the opposing party's motion or case-dispositive sanctions. Each party shall have three days to notify the Courtroom Administrator by email at blanca_lenzi@nvd.uscourts.gov if unable to attend and propose an alternative hearing time after consulting with opposing counsel. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Early Neutral Evaluation Conference
Wed 05/31 11:29 AM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 5/31/2017 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin ; Pla Counsel: Michael Balaban ; Def Counsel: Scott Greenberg ; Court Reporter/Recorder: None ; Time of Hearing: 9:35 a.m. to 12:00 p.m. ; No settlement was reached. This case is returned to the normal litigation track. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge & Gen Ord 2013-1 Short Trial Rules
Mon 04/10 3:40 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (MR) |
|
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/10 3:39 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re13 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/15/2017. Motions due by 9/14/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order
Fri 04/07 1:33 PM
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Dickerson . (Balaban, Michael) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 03/23 4:09 PM
REPLY to Response to6 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Clark County School District. Reply In Support of Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's TItle VII Harassment Claim (Greenberg, S.) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 03/16 6:19 PM
RESPONSE to6 Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Dickerson. Replies due by 3/23/2017. (Balaban, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Scheduling Early Neutral Evaluation Session
Thu 03/16 11:40 AM
ORDER Scheduling Early Neutral Evaluation Session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/19/2017 at 9:30 AM in LV Chambers, Room 3071, Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Las Vegas, Nevada, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 03/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 02/27 4:43 PM
ORDER Granting8 Stipulation for Extension of Time re6 MOTION to Dismiss . ( Responses due by 3/16/2017.) Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Stipulation
Mon 02/27 2:56 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re6 Motion to Dismiss, ; by Plaintiff Tiffany Dickerson. (Balaban, Michael) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Thu 02/16 12:55 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Clark County School District. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Greenberg, S.) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Thu 02/16 12:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Clark County School District. Responses due by 3/2/2017. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/2/2017. (Greenberg, S.) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 01/20 7:05 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Tiffany Dickerson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Balaban, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
minord
Minute Order
Fri 01/20 12:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe, on 1/20/2017. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c) (amended effective May 1, 2016). Plaintiff failed to file a certificate of interested parties. Accordingly, Plaintiff must file a certificate of interested parties no later than January 25, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/19 9:15 AM
Summons Issued as to Clark County School District re1 Complaint. (ADR) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
ENE Notice
Thu 01/19 9:11 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (ADR) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/18 10:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Clark County School District (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4441465), filed by Tiffany Dickerson. Proof of service due by 4/18/2017.(Balaban, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Thu 01/19 9:08 AM
Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR) |