Houseman v. Papke et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | William G Cobb |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00031 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Tue 11/14 4:08 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 11/14 4:04 PM
ORDER that this action is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to file IFP or pay filing fee pursuant to ECF No.7 Order; Clerk directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint Order on Motion for Leave to File ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Mon 08/07 9:09 AM
ORDER denying ECF Nos.3 ,5 Motions to Supplement and Join Claims to Complaint; giving Plaintiff 30 days to file amended complaint; directing Clerk to send Plaintiff 1983 form, instructions, copy of complaint, and copies of motions to supplement and join claims (mailed 8/7/2017); denying as moot ECF No.1 IFP application; directing Clerk to send Plaintiff non-prisoner IFP form (mailed 8/7/2017), giving Plaintiff 30 days to file fully complete IFP application or pay full $400 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 06/09 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address, by Plaintiff Roy Houseman. Old: 27826, Warm Springs. New: 1644 Athol Ave Apt 4, Henderson, NV 89011. (KR) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 03/20 4:15 PM
MOTION for Leave of Court to Join Claims Under F.R.C.P. 18, by Pro Se Plaintiff Roy Houseman. (KW) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 02/16 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address, by Plaintiff Roy Houseman. Old: WSCC to 1000 Caballa Blvd. (KW) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Amend/Correct Complaint
Tue 02/07 10:46 AM
MOTION for Leave to Supplement Complaint, by Plaintiff Roy Houseman. (KR) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Inmate Advisory Letter - NOS 550 & 555
Wed 01/18 1:09 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 01/18 1:06 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Roy Houseman.(DRM) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Motion for Counsel, | ||
Att: 4 Motion to Enter Exhibit to Complaint |