Tipton v. Guice et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Robert C Jones |
Referred: | Carla Baldwin |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00032 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2021 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, July 09, 2021 | ||
121 | 121
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/09 3:43 PM
ORDER Granting Stipulation to Dismiss (ECF No.120 ). This matter is dismissed with prejudice , each party will bear their own attorney fees and costs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR) |
|
Thursday, July 08, 2021 | ||
120 | 120
motion
Stipulation
Thu 07/08 6:16 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss re 118 Settlement Conference,,, by Defendant Guice. (Olsen, Rost) |