Avaya Holdings LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10089
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10089
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10094 |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Avaya Holdings LLC
350 Mount Kemble Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07960 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Thursday Aug 03, 2017 2:03 PM EDT |
Claims and Noticing Agent
Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent
830 3rd Avenue, 9th Floor www.primeclerk.com
New York, NY 10022 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago |
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Order of Final Decree
Fri 06/14 12:20 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Order of Final Decree . Notice Date 06/13/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
misc
Order of Final Decree (BNC)
Tue 06/11 11:20 AM
Order Of Final Decree Signed On 8/23/2018 Re: Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases . (Mercado, Tracey) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 06/11 11:21 AM
Case Closed. (Mercado, Tracey) |
||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Schedules
Thu 03/30 1:47 AM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of Avaya Holdings LLC. (Henes, Jonathan) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Thu 03/30 1:46 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of Avaya Holdings LLC. (Henes, Jonathan) |
|
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Thu 03/30 10:04 AM
Pending Deadlines Terminated Re: Statement of Financial Affairs, Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G & H. (Cappiello, Karen) |
||
Pending Deadlines Terminated Re: Statement of Financial Affairs, Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G & H. (Cappiello, Karen). | ||
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
misc
Add Claims and Noticing Agent
Mon 01/23 9:18 AM
Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent, added to the case. (Richards, Beverly) |
||
Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent, added to the case. (Richards, Beverly). | ||
Saturday, January 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Sun 01/22 12:21 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 01/21/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Fri 01/20 6:41 PM
Order signed on 1/20/2017 Granting Motion (I) Directing Joint Administration Of These Chapter 11 Cases Under Lead Case Number 17-10089 (SMB) and (II) Granting Related Relief. The Docket in Case Number 17-10089 SMB) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in the case of Avaya, Inc., Case Number 17-10089 (SMB). (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
4 | 4
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Fri 01/20 5:59 PM
(Disregard. See Corrected Entry.) Order signed on 1/20/2017 Granting Motion (I) Directing Joint Administration Of These Chapter 11 Cases Under Lead Case Number 17-10189 (SMB) and (II) Granting Related Relief. The Docket in Case Number 17-10189 SMB) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in the case of Avaya, Inc., Case Number 17-10189 (SMB). (Gomez, Jessica) Modified on 1/20/2017 (Gomez, Jessica). |
|
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Sat 01/21 1:19 PM
Case Jointly Administered under Lead Case Number 17-10089 SMB). (Gomez, Jessica) |
||
Case Jointly Administered under Lead Case Number 17-10089 SMB). (Gomez, Jessica). | ||
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Thu 01/19 5:00 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of Avaya Holdings LLC. (Henes, Jonathan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Thu 01/19 1:29 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil to Judge Stuart M. Bernstein. Judge Stuart M. Bernstein added to the case. (Porter, Minnie). |
|
1 | 1
38
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 01/19 11:32 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Jonathan S. Henes of Kirkland & Ellis LLP on behalf of Avaya Holdings LLC. (Henes, Jonathan) |
|
misc
Add Judge
Thu 01/19 11:33 AM
Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 01/19 4:26 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-10094 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11664383. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil added to the case. (Porter, Minnie). |