Metropolitan Properties, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Victoria S Kaufman |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10142 |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Feb 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Debtor
Metropolitan Properties, Inc.
7234 Claire Ave
Reseda, CA 91335-3825 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 01/19/2017 12:02 PM PST |
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 01/19 8:51 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(1:17-bk-10142) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44065467. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 01/19 8:49 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Metropolitan Properties, Inc. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 02/2/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 02/2/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 02/2/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 02/2/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 02/2/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 02/2/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 02/2/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 02/2/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 02/2/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 02/2/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 02/2/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 02/2/2017. (Afzali, Dominic) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Thu 01/19 8:50 AM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Metropolitan Properties, Inc.. (Afzali, Dominic) |