Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan J Dlott |
Referred: | Karen L Litkovitz |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00049 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2018 |
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security
|
|
Interested Party
SSA
|
|
Plaintiff
Cindy Smith
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 06/12 10:11 AM
Notation ORDER granting26 Stipulation for award of attorney fees. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 6/11/18. (wam) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation
Thu 06/07 12:54 PM
STIPULATION for an award of attorney fees under the EAJA by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Malia, Sarah) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 03/13 3:32 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re24 ORDER ADOPTING21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (jlw) |
|
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 03/13 3:31 PM
ORDER ADOPTING21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Accordingly, the Administrative Law Judges decision is REVERSED pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and REMANDED for an immediate award of benefits. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 3/13/2018. (jlw) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Response (non motion)
Tue 03/06 12:59 PM
Response by Plaintiff Cindy Smith. (Acciani, Henry) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Tue 02/20 6:06 PM
OBJECTION to21 Report and Recommendations by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Malia, Sarah) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 02/05 8:08 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the ALJ's decision be Reversed pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 USC 405(g) and Remanded for an immediate award of benefits. Objections to R&R due by 2/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/5/2018. (art) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Reply to Opposition to Statement of Specific Errors
Tue 09/05 1:51 PM
REPLY to Opposition re13 Statement of Specific Errors by Plaintiff Cindy Smith (Acciani, Henry) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 08/29 10:20 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting plaintiff's18 Motion for Extension of Time until 9/5/2017 to file a reply memorandum to defendant's17 Opposition to plaintiff's Statement of Specific Errors. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/29/2017. (art) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 08/29 10:21 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Reply to Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 9/5/2017. (art) |
||
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 08/28 4:43 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 Opposition to Statement of Specific Errors New date requested 9/5/2017. by Plaintiff Cindy Smith. (Acciani, Henry) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Opposition to Statement of Specific Errors
Fri 08/11 12:57 PM
Response in Opposition re13 Statement of Specific Errors by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Reply to Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 8/28/2017. (Malia, Sarah) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 07/21 10:47 AM
ORDER granting defendant's unopposed15 Motion for Extension of Time up to and including 8/16/2017 in which to file a memorandum in opposition to plaintiff's13 statement of specific errors. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 7/20/2017. (art) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 07/21 10:48 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 8/16/2017. (art) |
||
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 07/13 3:34 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/16/2017. to file Commissioner's Brief by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Malia, Sarah) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/13 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah G. Malia for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Malia, Sarah) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 06/05 7:31 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 7/17/2017. (art) |
||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Statement of Specific Errors
Fri 06/02 3:40 PM
STATEMENT OF SPECIFIC ERRORS by Plaintiff Cindy Smith Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 7/17/2017. (Acciani, Henry) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 06/01 8:30 AM
ORDER granting plaintiff's second unopposed11 Motion for Extension of Time up to and including 6/2/2017 in which to file a statement of specific errors. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/1/2017. (art) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 06/01 8:30 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Statement of Errors due by 6/2/2017. (art) |
||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 05/25 2:19 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 6/2/2017. by Plaintiff Cindy Smith. (Acciani, Henry) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 05/12 2:21 PM
ORDER granting plaintiff's unopposed9 Motion for Extension of Time up to and including 5/25/2017 in which to file a statement of specific errors. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/12/2017. (art) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 05/12 2:22 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Statement of Errors due by 5/25/2017. (art) |
||
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 05/11 5:02 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 5/25/2017. by Plaintiff Cindy Smith. (Acciani, Henry) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Tue 03/28 9:33 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to Magistrate Judges' General Order concerning Social Security Appeals. Plaintiff's statement of errors due to be filed by 5/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/28/2017. (art) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 03/28 9:33 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Statement of Errors due by 5/11/2017. (art) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certified Administrative Record - SSA Cases Only
Mon 03/27 12:39 PM
First CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Statement of Errors due by 5/11/2017. (Stark, John) |
|
Att: 1 court transcript index, | ||
Att: 2 documents related to administrative process, | ||
Att: 3 payment documents and decisions, | ||
Att: 4 jurisdictional documents and notices, | ||
Att: 5 non disability related development, | ||
Att: 6 disability related development, | ||
Att: 7 medical records part, | ||
Att: 8 medical records part 2, | ||
Att: 9 medical records part 3, | ||
Att: 10 medical records part 4, | ||
Att: 11 medical records part 5, | ||
Att: 12 medical records part 6 | ||
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 02/09 2:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (bjc) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/08 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shefali Baltz for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Baltz, Shefali) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 02/02 2:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/30/2017, answer due 3/31/2017. (bc) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
misc
Notice of Corrective Docket Entry
Tue 01/24 10:47 AM
Notice of Correction re3 Certificate of Clerk: Certified mail receipts originally omitted. Clerk attached receipts and regenerated NEF. (bc) |
||
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Mon 01/23 3:48 PM
CERTIFICATE of Clerk: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (bc) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Mail Receipt | ||
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 01/20 10:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jlw) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/19 9:49 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of SSA ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5804585), filed by Cindy Smith. (Acciani, Henry) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Form Regional Chief Counsel, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Form Attorney General, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Form US Attorney |