Perez v. Lechler et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00060 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 18, 2017 5:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
Exterior Systems, Inc.
8633 Memorial Drive
Plain City, OH 43064 |
|
Defendant
Exterior Systems, Inc. 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan
8633 Memorial Drive
Plain City, OH 43064 |
|
Defendant
Michael A. Lechler
8633 Memorial Drive
Plain City, OH 43064 |
|
Plaintiff
Thomas E. Perez
U.S. Department of Labor 1240 East Ninth Street Room 881
Cleveland, OH 44199 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment - Consent
Fri 03/31 5:10 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/31/2017. (cw) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Pretrial Order
Fri 03/17 9:09 AM
Proposed Consent Judgment and Order by Plaintiff Thomas E. Perez. (Marta, Wayne) Modified text on 3/17/2017 (er) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 01/20 4:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Exterior Systems, Inc. 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan on 1/20/2017, answer due 3/21/2017. (Marta, Wayne) |
|
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 01/20 4:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Exterior Systems, Inc. on 1/20/2017, answer due 3/21/2017. (Marta, Wayne) |
|
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 01/20 4:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Michael A. Lechler on 1/20/2017, answer due 3/21/2017. (Marta, Wayne) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 01/19 12:06 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Thomas E. Perez re1 Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet (Marta, Wayne) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/19 11:32 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas E. Perez. (Marta, Wayne) |