Pure Exhibits, Inc.
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Donald R Cassling |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-01593 |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Debtor
Pure Exhibits, Inc.
9624 S Cicero - Suite 234
Oak Lawn, IL 60453 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Norman B Newman
Much Shelist, P.C. 191 North Wacker Drive Ste 1800
Chicago, IL 60606 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 01/20/2017 12:03 AM CST |
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a)
Thu 01/19 3:02 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $335, Filed by John F Hiltz on behalf of Pure Exhibits, Inc. (Hiltz, John) |
|
Att: 1 Signature Pages | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 01/19 3:04 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-01593 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 33702498. Fee Amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Thu 01/19 4:01 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/16/2017 at 12:00 PM at 219 South Dearborn, Office of the U.S. Trustee, 8th Floor, Room 800, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (admin, ) |