Healing Touch Day Spas, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Peter Carroll |
Case #: | 9:17-bk-10096 |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Debtor
Healing Touch Day Spas, Inc.
180 Mary Ave
Nipomo, CA 93444-7822 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Jerry Namba (TR)
504 East Chapel Street
Santa Maria, CA 93454 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 01/20/2017 12:02 AM PST |
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 01/19 2:17 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(9:17-bk-10096) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44069371. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 01/19 2:09 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Healing Touch Day Spas, Inc. (Tos, Leslie) |
|
Att: 1 Petition 2 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Thu 01/19 2:11 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Healing Touch Day Spas, Inc.. (Tos, Leslie) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Thu 01/19 2:17 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/27/2017 at 10:00 AM at 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. (Tos, Leslie) |