RPR Larkspur Owner, LLC v. Jones
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard Seeborg |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00214 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2017 1:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
Donald Jones
2300 Lincoln Village Circle, #165
Larkspur, CA 94939 |
|
Plaintiff
RPR Larkspur Owner, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Relating Case
Fri 04/28 2:04 PM
ORDER RELATING CASES 17-00214 RS and 17-01553 DMR. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/28/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017) (cl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (4/28/2017) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases
Wed 04/19 9:38 AM
SUA SPONTE ORDER RE CASE RELATION TO 17-CV-00214 RS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, ORDER REASSIGNING CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT IFP APPLICATION AND REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF MARIN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on April 19, 2017. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Receipt
Thu 03/30 5:07 PM
Acknowledgement of Receipt from Marin County Superior Court of10 Remand Order. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
utility
Remark
Thu 03/23 2:50 PM
Certified copy of10 Remand Order and Docket Sheet sent to the Marin County Superior Court. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Terminate Civil Case
Wed 02/22 1:57 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, AND REMANDING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/22/17.(clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 01/24 11:05 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Parties or counsel may appear personally at 10:00 a.m. or file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am. If any party files such a request to appear by telephone, the Case Management Conference shall be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017) (cl, COURT STAFF) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 01/24 9:46 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/24/17.(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 01/24 8:48 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/24/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 01/23 4:44 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding sua sponte remand to state court. Objections due within fourteen days of service. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on January 23, 2017. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 01/23 4:36 PM
Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/19 5:29 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by RPR Larkspur Owner, LLC.. (Rothbard, Todd) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 01/19 2:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Donald Jones. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
2 | 2
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 01/19 2:28 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 01/19 2:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is 16-03823 (FEE STATUS: IFPP). Filed byDonald Jones. Consent/Declination due by 1/31/2017.(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |