Streeter et al v. Cordis Corporation et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward M Chen |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00239 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2017 1:18 AM PDT |
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Confluent Medical Technologies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cordis Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Plaintiff
Georgette Metro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Turks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremias Torres
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven L. Streeter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gwendolyn Streeter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynda Shlitz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Peters
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Monroe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Metro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Bruce Kash
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lila Mae Kash
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Gray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jack Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Belinda Askew
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Askew
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 28 2017
ORDER REMANDING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/28/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017) |
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |