Brouns v. Fedex Corporation
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sallie Kim |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00240 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 13, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2017 2:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
Fedex Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Sedgwick CMS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anna Brouns
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Feb 13 2019
ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 2/13/2019. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019) |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
141 | 141
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 03/19 12:55 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 140 Stipulation to Dismiss Case with Prejudice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
140 | 140
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 03/18 3:53 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS CASE WITH PREJUDICE filed by Anna Brouns. (Viadro, Christopher) |