Monica L Herriott et al v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00266 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 23, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 18, 2017 2:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monica L. Herriott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William J. Herriott, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 06/29 12:21 PM
ORDER of USCA (fabS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 10/15 7:11 AM
USCA Case Number 20-17017 9th Circuit for14 Notice of Appeal filed by William J. Herriott, Jr., Monica L. Herriott. (fabS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, October 08, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 10/08 6:35 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Monica L. Herriott, William J. Herriott, Jr. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-15042824 paid.)(Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, September 23, 2020 | ||
utility
MDL Member Case Closed
Thu 09/24 10:34 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: MDL 2672, ursuant to the Court's order of 9/23/20 in the MDL 15-md-2672 CRB master file (dkt. #7703), civil case no. 3:17-cv-00266 CRB is terminated. cc: JPMDL (mclS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 07/03 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Steve Mikhov (Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 01/19 2:42 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:16-cv-09444. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11 Conditional Transfer Order - 79 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2672, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of California and assigned to Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Case transferred electronically. (dro) | |
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STAYING CASE by Judge David O. Carter: All proceedings in this case are hereby STAYED pending a determination by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (the MDL Panel) concerning the transfer of this action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (es) | |
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:15-cv-01930 DOC(SPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich and Judge Otis D. Wright, II to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-09444 DOC(SPx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn) | |
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Monica L. Herriott, William J. Herriott, Jr, identifying Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Mikhov, Steve) | |
7 | 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Plaintiffs amending Complaint - (Discovery), JURY DEMAND, filed by plaintiff Monica L. Herriott, William J. Herriott, Jr(Mikhov, Steve) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit RISC | ||
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (ghap) | |
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,, identifying Volkswagen AG. (Oswell, Laura) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. Related Case(s): 02:15-cv-07367; 2:15-cv-07375; 2:15-cv-07390; 2:15-cv-07391; 2:15-cv-07395; 2:15-cv-07429; 2:15-cv-07430; 2:15-cv-07431; 2:15-cv-07432; 2:15-cv-07473; 2:15-cv-07474; 2:15-cv-07475; 2:15-cv-07477; 2:15-cv-07517; 2:15-cv-01930; 2:15-cv-01948; 2:15-cv-01525; 8:16-cv-00209; 2:16-cv-01143; 2:16-cv-1120; 2:16-cv-01119; 2:16-cv-01104; 2:16-cv-01205; 2:16-cv-01164; 2:16-cv-01507; 2:16-cv-01527; 2:16-cv-01539; 2:16-cv-01563; 2:16-cv-01573; 2:16-cv-01575; 2:16-cv-01576; 2:16-cv-01577; 2:16-cv-01578; 2:16-cv-01580; 2:16-cv-1661; 2:16-cv-1662; 2:16-cv-1663; 5:16-cv-00462; 2:16-cv-01970; 2:16-cv-02014; 2:16-cv-02046; 2:16-cv-02148; 2:16-cv-02210; 2:16-cv-02214; 2:16-cv-02301; 2:16-cv-02302; 2:16-cv-02420; 2:16-cv-02429; 2:16-cv-02438; 2:16-cv-02469; 2:16-cv-2637; 2:16-cv-2796; 2:16-cv-805; 2:16-cv-02892; 2:16-cv-03074; 2:16-cv-03161; 5:16-cv-933; 2:16-cv-03162; 2:16-cv-3163; 5:16-cv-934; 8:16-cv-894; 2:16-cv-3385; 2:16-cv-3537; 2:16-cv-3727; 5:16-cv-1100; 2:16-cv-03776; 2:16-cv-3985; 2:16-cv-04171; 5:16-cv-01238; 2:16-cv-04177; 2:16-cv-04178; 2:16-cv-04179; 2:16-cv-04180; 2:16-cv-04181; 2:16-cv-4242; 2:16-cv-4244; 2:16-cv-4246; 8:16-cv-01111; 2:16-cv-4331; 2:16-cv-04333; 2:16-cv-04336; 2:16-cv-04338; 2:16-cv-4382; 8:16-cv-1139; 2:16-cv-4386; 2:16-cv-4392; 2:16-cv-4393; 2:16-cv-4394; 2:16-cv-4395; 2:16-cv-4399; 2:16-cv-4400; 2:16-cv-4401; 2:16-cv-4402; 2:16-cv-4403; 2:16-cv-4404;2:16-cv-4405;2:16-cv-04406; 2:16-cv-4423; 2:16-cv-4514; 2:16-cv-4630; 5:16-cv-1406; 2:16-cv-4774; 5:16-cv-01468; 8:16-cv-01252; 2:16-cv-04963; 8:16-cv-01256; 5:16-cv-01475; 5:16-cv-01476; 5:16-cv-01480; 2:16-cv-04989; 8:16-cv-01259; 2:16-cv-04997; 5:16-cv-01485; 2:16-cv-05068; 8:16-cv-01292; 8:16-CV-01314; 2:16-cv-5355; 2:16-cv-05631; 5:16-cv-01649; 5:16-cv-01650; 2:16-cv-05669; 2:16-cv-05776; 2:16-cv-05868; 2:16-cv-05874; 5:16-cv-01706; 5:16-cv-01707; 5:16-cv-01708; 2:16-cv-05875; 2:16-cv-05876; 8:16-cv-01456; 5:16-cv-01709; 2:16-cv-05877; 8:16-cv-01457; 8:16-cv-01458; 2:16-cv-05879; 8:16-cv-01459; 2:16-cv-05880; 2:16-cv-05881; 2:16-cv-05882; 2:16-cv-058832:16-cv-05938; 2:16-cv-06023; 8:16-cv-01491; 5:16-cv-01732; 2:16-cv-6564; 5:16-cv-01865; 5:16-cv-01917; 2:16-cv-6831; 2:16-cv-6832; 2:16-cv-6838; 2:16-cv-6839; 2:16-cv-6899; 2:16-cv-6900; 2:16-cv-6909; 2:16-cv-6917; 2:16-cv-06947; 2:16-cv-07065; 5:16-cv-02013; 5:16-cv-02014; 5:16-cv-02017; 5:16-cv-02018; 2:16-cv-07152; 2:16-cv-07255; 2:16-cv-07270; 8:16-cv-01916; 2:16-cv-7799; 2:16-cv-7945; 2:16-cv-7951; 2:16-cv-7957; 2:16-cv-07972; 2:16-cv-7985; 2:16-cv-7990; 2:16-cv-8065; 2:16-cv-8173; 5:16-cv-02392; 2:16-cv-08635; 2:16-cv-08648; 2:16-cv-08988; 2:16-cv-9137; 2:16-cv-9154; 2:16-cv-9235; 5:16-CV-02566; 2:16-cv-9327; 2:16-cv-05355; 2:16-cv-09431 (Oswell, Laura) | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. (Oswell, Laura) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC642089 Receipt No: 0973-19092339 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. (Attorney Laura Kabler Oswell added to party VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., (pty:dft))(Oswell, Laura) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal | ||
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., filed by plaintiffs Monica L. Herriott, William J. Herriott, Jr. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/29/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap) | ||
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Monica L. Herriott, William J. Herriott, Jr, upon Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 12/1/2016, answer due 12/22/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky Degeorge-Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/2/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) |