Grisham v. Asbury SC JPV LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00269 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 18, 2017 2:12 AM PDT |
Defendant
Asbury SC JPV LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Porsche Cars North America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Edward Grisham, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
utility
MDL Member Case Closed
Thu 08/20 4:15 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: MDL 2672, Pursuant to the Court's order of 7/21/20 in the MDL 15-md-2672 CRB master file (dkt. #7629), civil case no. 3:17-cv-00269 CRB is terminated. cc: JPMDL. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 01/19 3:07 PM
Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 6:16-cv-03999. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 Case transferred to Northern District of California per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 79. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (alew, ) | |
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
4 | 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Porsche Cars North America Inc.(kmca) | |
3 | 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Asbury SC JPV LLC.(kmca) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2016-CP 23-06817 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-6918600), filed by Porsche Cars North America Inc, Asbury SC JPV LLC.(kmca) | |
Att: 1 State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A Proof of Service to PCNA, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B Proof of Service Asbury SC, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C Affidavit of Dean Calloway and Asbury SC's Consent to Removal, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D 2014 Porsche Cayenne documentation |