7
|
|
7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 04/08 3:34 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE The filing of the judgment dated April 8, 2020 in any case that was previously dismissed is a function of the courts automated systems and is not intended to have any effect on such prior dismissal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/08 2:59 PM
ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OFDEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/8/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 02/06 8:17 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet, Summons & Complaint served on Pfizer Inc. on January 23, 2017, filed by Joseph J. Ciandella. (Baden, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/20 1:16 PM
Summons Issued as to Defendant Pfizer Inc.. (tnS) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 01/19 3:41 PM
Case assigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 01/19 1:18 PM
Proposed Summons. (Baden, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/19 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT Joseph J. Ciandella against Inc. Pfizer ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11086673.). Filed byJoseph J. Ciandella.(Baden, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
|