Soto et al v. O.C. Communications, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00251 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2017 1:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
O.C. Communications, Inc.
2204 Kausen Drive Suite 100
Elk Grove, CA 95758 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Desidero Soto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Stricklen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
49 | 49
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 03/22 2:47 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017) |
|
48 | 48
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/22 1:58 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen Of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/22/2017) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/21 11:13 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by O.C. Communications, Inc... (Mann, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/21/2017) |
|
46 | 46
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/21 8:56 AM
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Camille Fundora. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017) |
|
45 | 45
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/21 8:55 AM
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Shanon J. Carson. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017) |
|
44 | 44
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/21 8:54 AM
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/20 12:51 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/20/2017) |
|
42 | 42
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/20 12:36 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Camille Fundora ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11245320.) filed by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen. (Fundora, Camille) (Filed on 3/20/2017) |
|
41 | 41
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/20 12:30 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Shanon J. Carson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11245265.) filed by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen. (Carson, Shanon) (Filed on 3/20/2017) |
|
40 | 40
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/20 12:11 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11245197.) filed by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen. (Schalman-Bergen, Sarah) (Filed on 3/20/2017) |
|
39 | 39
motion
Appear
Mon 03/20 12:00 PM
*** REFER TO DOCUMENT 41 . *** MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shanon J. Carson filed by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen. (Carson, Shanon) (Filed on 3/20/2017) Modified on 3/20/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/14 2:58 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/14/2017) |
|
37 | 37
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/14 2:43 PM
NOTICE by O.C. Communications, Inc. of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Mann, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/14/2017) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/13 3:14 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen Of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/13/2017) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/10 3:38 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen Of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/10/2017) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/10 1:39 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen Of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/10/2017) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Statement
Fri 03/10 10:40 AM
Statement Corporate Disclosure by O.C. Communications, Inc.. (Mann, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/10/2017) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 03/10 10:38 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by O.C. Communications, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Forrest Freeman, Other Affiliate Reggie Wight, Other Affiliate Carla Freeman, Other Affiliate Larry Wray, Other Affiliate Peter Tataryn, Other Affiliate The O.C. Communications Employee Stock Ownership Plan for O.C. Communications, Inc.. (Mann, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/10/2017) |
|
31 | 31
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/10 10:30 AM
ANSWER to Complaint byO.C. Communications, Inc.. (Mann, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/10/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/09 4:30 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen Of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/9/2017) |
|
29 | 29
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Thu 03/09 2:29 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge Consent/Declination due by 3/23/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/23/2017. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/08 3:11 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/8/2017) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/06 4:24 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen Of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/6/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/02 3:45 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen of Filing of Consents to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/2/2017) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/01 4:35 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen of Filing of Consents to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/1/2017) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/24 1:45 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 2/24/2017) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 02/24 11:36 AM
STIPULATION Enlarging Time to Respond to Complaint filed by O.C. Communications, Inc.. (Mann, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/24/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/23 2:28 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/17 3:08 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen Of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 2/17/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/16 4:01 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 2/16/2017) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/13 4:09 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/10 3:45 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 2/10/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/09 4:38 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen of Filing of Consents to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 2/9/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/08 5:02 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen of Filing of Consents to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 2/8/2017) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/03 4:57 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen Of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/02 4:18 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/01 3:23 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen Notice of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 02/01 1:04 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen.. (Cottrell, Carolyn) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 01/30 4:19 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 01/27 1:03 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Cottrell, Carolyn) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 01/25 5:11 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/24 5:50 PM
NOTICE by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen Of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 01/19 10:48 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen . (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/19 9:29 AM
Summons Issued as to O.C. Communications, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 01/19 9:28 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 01/19 8:09 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/2/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 01/19 8:11 AM
Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] Current Civil Cover Sheet can be found at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Please re-file in its entirety Re:1 Complaint filed by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
||
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action by Desidero Soto, Steven Stricklen. (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 1/18/2017) Modified on 1/19/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). | |
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 1/18/2017) | |
1 | 1 Class Action COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against O.C. Communications, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-11084245). Filed by Steven Stricklen, Desidero Soto.(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 1/18/2017) Modified on 1/19/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet |