Gambord v. Westside Gas, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00262 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 18, 2017 1:59 AM PDT |
Defendant
Westside Gas, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Tornessa, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Gambord
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jun 26 2017
ORDER GRANTING 18 MOTION TO SERVE VIA THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/26/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017) |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 09/29 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of entire action by Richard Gambord (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 9/29/2017) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/15 1:44 PM
ORDER RE 34 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/15/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/14 4:17 PM
NOTICE by Richard Gambord of Settlement of Entire Action (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 9/14/2017) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/07 12:52 PM
ORDER GRANTING 32 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/7/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Tue 09/05 4:39 PM
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND filed by Tornessa, Inc.. (Shaw, Melissa) (Filed on 9/5/2017) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 08/29 3:55 PM
ORDER GRANTING 30 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/29/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 08/28 3:34 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Tornessa, Inc.. (Shaw, Melissa) (Filed on 8/28/2017) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 08/14 6:08 PM
ORDER GRANTING 28 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR WESTSIDE GAS, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/14/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017) |
|
28 | 28
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 08/14 5:06 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re1 Complaint, extending time for Defendant Westside Gas, Inc. to respond filed by Richard Gambord. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 8/14/2017) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Mon 08/07 9:57 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND filed by Tornessa, Inc.. (Shaw, Melissa) (Filed on 8/7/2017) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/10 8:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Gambord. Westside Gas, Inc. served on 7/10/2017, answer due 7/31/2017. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 7/10/2017) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 07/07 10:37 AM
ORDER GRANTING 24 STIPULATION EXTENDING LAST DATE TO CONDUCT JOINT SITE INSPECTION AND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/7/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 07/06 10:21 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re1 Complaint, EXTENDING LAST DATE TO HOLD JOINT SITE INSPECTION AND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Tornessa, Inc.. (Shaw, Melissa) (Filed on 7/6/2017) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/26 3:52 PM
ORDER GRANTING 18 MOTION TO SERVE VIA THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/26/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Mon 06/26 3:49 PM
ORDER GRANTING 20 REQUEST TO EXTEND SERVICE DEADLINE TO JULY 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/26/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017) |
|
21 | 21
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 06/26 10:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Gambord. Tornessa, Inc. served on 6/23/2017, answer due 7/14/2017. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 6/26/2017) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Mon 06/26 8:53 AM
Fourth ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Fourth Request For Administrative Relief From Service Deadline re4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case,15 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed by Richard Gambord. Responses due by 6/30/2017.(Best, Zachary) (Filed on 6/26/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/08 2:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Tornessa, Inc.. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 06/07 1:25 PM
First MOTION To Serve The Secretary of State on Behalf of Westside Gas, Inc. re5 Summons Issued filed by Richard Gambord. Responses due by 6/21/2017. Replies due by 6/28/2017.(Best, Zachary) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Zachary M. Best in Support of Plaintiff's Application, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - F, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 06/06 1:18 PM
Proposed Summons. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 6/6/2017) |
|
16 | 16
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 06/06 1:17 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT ASSERTING DENIAL OF RIGHT OF ACCESS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, DAMAGES, ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS (ADA) against All Defendants. Filed byRichard Gambord. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 6/6/2017) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Mon 06/05 12:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING 14 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM SERVICE DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/5/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Fri 06/02 1:25 PM
Third ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relief from service deadline re4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case,13 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11,1 Complaint, ASSERTING DENIAL OF RIGHT OF ACCESS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT (ADA) filed by Richard Gambord. Responses due by 6/6/2017.(Best, Zachary) (Filed on 6/2/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Zachary M. Best in Support of Plaintiff's Request, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - E | ||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Thu 04/13 1:19 PM
ORDER GRANTING 12 MOTION EXTENDING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/13/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Wed 04/12 2:11 PM
Second ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relief from service deadline and first request to extend deadline to conduct joint site inspection re4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case,11 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed by Richard Gambord. Responses due by 4/17/2017.(Best, Zachary) (Filed on 4/12/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Zachary M. Best in Support of Plaintiff's Request | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Tue 03/21 2:16 PM
ORDER GRANTING 10 MOTION TO EXTEND SERVICE DEADLINE TO APRIL 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/21/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Mon 03/20 1:10 PM
First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Administrative Relief From Service Deadline re4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case,1 Complaint, ASSERTING DENIAL OF RIGHT OF ACCESS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT (ADA) filed by Richard Gambord. Responses due by 3/24/2017.(Best, Zachary) (Filed on 3/20/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Zachary M. Best, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - D | ||
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 02/14 3:16 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains s referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 2/14/2017.(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Tue 02/14 1:55 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 02/14 9:52 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard Gambord.. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Fri 02/03 11:23 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/17/2017. Please note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. Form is attached and also available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/19 2:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Westside Gas, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Thu 01/19 2:28 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 01/19 2:15 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/2/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 01/19 11:58 AM
Proposed Summons. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/19 11:55 AM
COMPLAINT ASSERTING DENIAL OF RIGHT OF ACCESS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, DAMAGES, ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS (ADA) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11086185.). Filed byRichard Gambord.(Best, Zachary) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |