Pourya Malek v. Jeffery Green et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Referred: | Virginia K Demarchi |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00263 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 18, 2017 2:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
Elisardo Favela
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffery Green
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lance Sandri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pourya Malek
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
92 | 92
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 12/06 5:33 PM
ORDER GRANTING 91 STIPULATION RE: FULL DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/6/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, December 05, 2018 | ||
91 | 91
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 12/05 2:56 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Full Dismissal of All Claims filed by Elisardo Favela, Jeffery Green, Lance Sandri.(Rogoyski, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service |