Love Grace Holdings, Inc.
Louisiana Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Douglas D Dodd |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-10057 |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2021 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jun 28, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Love Grace Holdings, Inc.
9100 Bluebonnet Centre Blvd Ste 401
Baton Rouge, LA 70809-2985 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
400 Poydras Street Suite 2110
New Orleans, LA 70130 |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 12:01 PM CDT |
Tuesday, February 09, 2021 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 02/09 9:53 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (cluc) |