Notesettlors LLC
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert N Kwan |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-10698 |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 24, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 01, 2017 |
Debtor
Notesettlors LLC
2100 Redondo Beach Blvd Ste C102
Torrance, CA 90504-1683 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Brad D Krasnoff (TR)
1900 Avenue of the Stars, 11th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 01/20/2017 12:01 PM PST |