JTC'S LLC
Arizona Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Paul Sala |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-00604 |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
JTC'S LLC
8700 E Mountain View Rd Unit 1086
Scottsdale, AZ 85258-1473 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003 |
Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
court
Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL) (DISMISSED)
Tue 04/25 10:00 AM
The case having been dismissed; IT IS ORDERED that the case is closed and if a trustee has been appointed, the trustee is discharged from and relieved of his trust. Judge Paul Sala (Kelly, Margaret) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
court
Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee)
Mon 04/17 12:12 PM
Fee Due Amendment to Mailing List (31.00 fee) $ 31 (Root, Krystal) |
||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment
Mon 04/17 12:22 PM
Alternative Receipt of Amendment to Mailing List (31.00 fee)(2:17-bk-00604-PS) [other,1559] ( 31.00) Filing Fee not Paid (Root) |
||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sun 04/16 9:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (Admin.) |
|
38 | 38
order
oOther Order to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC
Fri 04/14 1:52 PM
Second ORDER for non-payment of required filing fee signed on 4/14/2017 . (Kelly, Margaret) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
court
zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)
Fri 03/24 10:01 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal Order (Admin.) |
|
36 | 36
vCal
Virtual Minute Entry
Wed 03/22 3:37 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 03/23/2017 Subject: CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE. Appearances: NONE. Proceedings: VACATED: CASE DISMISSED 3/22/17. (vCal Hearing ID (1366812)). (Beller, Luann) |
|
35 | 35
order
oDismissing Case - VAN Form
Wed 03/22 10:16 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case Debtor . (Kelly, Margaret) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
trustee
Minutes of 341 Meeting
Tue 03/14 3:05 PM
Amended Minutes of 341 Meeting TRUSTEE RECOMMENDS DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PRODUCE IDI DOCS, FAILURE TO ATTEND IDI, FAILURE TO FILE MONTHLY OPERATING RPTS, FAILURE TO APPEAR filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.(BERNATAVICIUS, EDWARD) |
|
33 | 33
trustee
Minutes of 341 Meeting
Tue 03/14 2:48 PM
Minutes of 341 Meeting filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.(BERNATAVICIUS, EDWARD) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 03/09 11:10 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice (Admin.) |
|
31 | 31
court
Deficiency/Warning Notc to Atty for No Declaration of Electronic Filing (Form)
Tue 03/07 7:37 AM
Deficiency Notice to Attorney RE: Non-Compliance With Local Rule 1007-1(c) for No Declaration of Electronic Filing. (Kelly, Margaret) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 03/01 11:10 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice (Admin.) |
|
29 | 29
order
oChapter 11 Status Conference (MCW/PS Form)
Mon 02/27 8:47 AM
ORDER Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference signed on 2/27/2017 Status Hearing set for 3/23/2017 at 10:00 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 6th Floor, Courtroom 601, Phoenix, AZ (PS) . (Beller, Luann) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
vCal
Virtual Minute Entry
Fri 02/24 8:16 AM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 03/06/2017 Subject: CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE. Appearances: NONE. Proceedings: VACATED: CASE DISMISSED 2/6/17. (vCal Hearing ID (1364725)). (Beller, Luann) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
oNonpayment of Required Filing Fee - VAN Form
Wed 02/22 12:51 PM
ORDER Re: Nonpayment of Required Filing Fee . (Kelly, Margaret) |
|
24 | 24
court
Deficiency Memo (QC Form)
Wed 02/22 12:48 PM
Deficiency Memo (Kelly, Margaret) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Thu 02/23 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (Admin.) |
|
26 | 26
court
zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)
Thu 02/23 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Admin.) |
|
23 | 23
court
BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part
Tue 02/21 3:27 PM
Chapter 11 Corp/Part Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/14/2017 at 11:00 AM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX) (Kelly, Margaret) |
|
22 | 22
order
oReinstate Case
Tue 02/21 3:24 PM
ORDER Granting Motion to Reinstate Case Debtor signed on 2/21/2017 . (Kelly, Margaret) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)
Tue 02/21 2:52 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by RICHARD A DRAKE of DRAKE LAW FIRM PLC on behalf of JTC'S LLC .(DRAKE, RICHARD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
20 | 20
motion
Reinstate Case (Motion to)
Tue 02/21 2:51 PM
Motion to Reinstate Case filed by RICHARD A DRAKE of DRAKE LAW FIRM PLC on behalf of JTC'S LLC. (DRAKE, RICHARD) |
|
19 | 19
other
AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)
Tue 02/21 2:40 PM
Schedules and Statements for Non-Individual filed by RICHARD A DRAKE of DRAKE LAW FIRM PLC on behalf of JTC'S LLC. Electronic Filing Declaration due by 02/28/2017, (DRAKE, RICHARD) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
court
zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)
Wed 02/08 11:07 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal Order (Admin.) |
|
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 02/08 11:07 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice (Admin.) |
|
16 | 16
order
oDismissing Case - VAN Form
Mon 02/06 10:56 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case Debtor . (Kelly, Margaret) |
|
15 | 15
order
oChapter 11 Status Conference (MCW/PS Form)
Mon 02/06 10:12 AM
ORDER Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference signed on 2/6/2017 Status Hearing set for 3/6/2017 at 10:00 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 6th Floor, Courtroom 601, Phoenix, AZ (PS) . (Beller, Luann) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
notice
Withdrawal (Notice of)
Wed 02/01 2:50 PM
Notice of Withdrawal OF MOTION FOR JOINT ADMINISTRATION filed by RICHARD A DRAKE of DRAKE LAW FIRM PLC on behalf of JTC'S LLC .(DRAKE, RICHARD) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)
Wed 02/01 10:15 AM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order re MOTION FOR JOINT ADMINISTRATION filed by RICHARD A DRAKE of DRAKE LAW FIRM PLC on behalf of JTC'S LLC .(DRAKE, RICHARD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
12 | 12
3
pgs
motion
Joint Administration (Motion for)
Wed 02/01 10:14 AM
Motion for Joint Administration MOTION FOR JOINT ADMINISTRATION filed by RICHARD A DRAKE of DRAKE LAW FIRM PLC on behalf of JTC'S LLC. (DRAKE, RICHARD) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
oSubstitute Attorney
Tue 01/31 1:16 PM
ORDER Granting Motion to Substitute Attorney terminating CHRISTOPHER J PATTOCK, signed on 1/31/2017 . (Kelly, Margaret) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Substitute Attorney (Motion to)
Tue 01/31 10:35 AM
Motion to Substitute Attorney and Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE. (BERNATAVICIUS, EDWARD) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Appearance (Notice of)
Mon 01/30 3:00 PM
Amended Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew M Ellis of ANDREW M. ELLIS LAW, PLLC on behalf of Leonard Noel Roberts.(Ellis, Andrew) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Appearance (Notice of)
Mon 01/30 2:49 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew M Ellis of ANDREW M. ELLIS LAW, PLLC on behalf of Leonard Noel Roberts.(Ellis, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Appearance (Notice of)
Wed 01/25 12:00 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by CHRISTOPHER J PATTOCK of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.(PATTOCK, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 01/25 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
court
zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)
Wed 01/25 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Admin.) |
|
4 | 4
court
BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part
Mon 01/23 7:54 AM
Chapter 11 Corp/Part Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/21/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX) (Kelly, Margaret) |
|
3 | 3
court
Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)
Mon 01/23 7:51 AM
Deficiency Notice to Debtor and Attorney for Debtor That All Required Documents Were Not Filed. (Kelly, Margaret) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment
Mon 01/23 10:54 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:17-bk-00604) [other,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 27910820. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business)
Fri 01/20 11:50 PM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 02/21/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX). (Admin, Admin) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
other
2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1717.00 fee)
Fri 01/20 6:33 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 02/10/2017, Master Mailing due 01/27/2017, Schedules A/B-J due 02/3/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 02/3/2017, Attorney Disclosure Statement due 02/3/2017, Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income due by 02/3/2017, Payment Advices Declaration Required by 11 USC Section 521(a)(1)(B)(iv) due by 02/3/2017, filed by RICHARD A DRAKE of DRAKE LAW FIRM PLC on behalf of JTC'S LLC (DRAKE, RICHARD) |