Lebamoff Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Snyder et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Arthur J Tarnow |
Referred: | Anthony P Patti |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-10191 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 19, 2017 5:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
Andrew J. Deloney
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William Schuette
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rick Snyder
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Michigan Beer & Wine Wholesalers Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Donovan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Doust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lebamoff Enterprises, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jack Schulz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jack Stride
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 21, 2021 | ||
77 | 77
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Costs Order on Report and Recommendation
Tue 12/21 4:39 PM
ORDER denying67 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting72 Motion for Review; adopting76 Report and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan) |