Huntington National Bank v. Kalla et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael H Watson |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00063 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 19, 2017 5:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
Abdullah M Kalla
120 Stonebridge Drive
Oakdale, PA 15071 |
|
Defendant
Melissa Ann Kalla
120 Stonebridge Drive
Oakdale, PA 15071 |
|
Defendant
Teddie M Livingston
|
|
Defendant
Frederick Allen McShan
|
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Huntington National Bank
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 10/24 11:13 AM
ORDER granting18 United States' Motion for Removal of Stay and Dismissal of the Case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 10/24/19. (jk) |
|
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 10/23 4:51 PM
MOTION Lift Stay and Dismiss Case re7 Order on Motion to Stay by Defendant United States of America. (Wolfe, Leah) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
9
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 10/22 11:07 AM
Stipulated Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 10/22/18. (jk) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 04/18 9:07 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 Joint MOTION to Vacate Stay and Reactivate Case filed by Defendant United States of America. (Wolfe, Leah) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Vacate
Thu 04/05 11:40 AM
Joint MOTION to Vacate Stay and Reactivate Case by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank. (Deighton, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Limited Warranty Deed, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Land Contract, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Affidavit | ||
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 12/04 9:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn M Blake for Defendants Abdullah M Kalla, Melissa Ann Kalla (Blake, Shawn) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 09/20 3:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Watson: Telephone Conference held on 9/20/2017. (Court Reporter: Lahana DuFour) (jk) |
||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/13 3:49 PM
ORDER - Telephone Status Conference set for 9/20/2017 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Judge Michael H. Watson on 9/13/17. (jk) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 08/09 1:34 PM
ORDER denying11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/9/2017. (ew) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 08/08 11:22 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Teddie M Livingston. (Madison, Walter) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order of Recusal
Tue 07/25 11:16 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge George C. Smith recused. Case randomly reassigned by the Clerk to Judge Michael H. Watson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 7/25/17. (sem) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Fri 07/21 2:55 PM
ORDER: Both Judge Sargus and Judge Smith agree that this matter relates to the subject of the pending civil case and that all further proceedings with respect to the matter should be handled by Judge Smith. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Judge George C. Smith on 7/21/2017. (mas) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order of Recusal
Mon 03/13 10:24 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus recused. Case reassigned to Judge George C. Smith for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 03/13/2017. (dh1) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 03/01 1:30 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 3/1/2017. (mas) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Related Case Memorandum
Thu 02/23 4:18 PM
RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:15-cr-240 (1) ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/23/17. (sem) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 02/14 1:20 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re2 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendant United States of America. (Wolfe, Leah) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 02/02 10:02 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re2 MOTION to Stay filed by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank. (Deighton, Eric) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Stay
Fri 01/20 1:22 PM
MOTION to Stay by Defendant United States of America. (Wolfe, Leah) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 01/20 9:52 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County Court of Common Pleas, case number 16 CV 366, filed by United States of America. (Wolfe, Leah) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B |