Seymour v. Magic Industries, Inc
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael H Watson |
Referred: | Terence P Kemp |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00068 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 29:2617 Family and Medical Leave Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 19, 2017 5:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
Magic Industries, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Terrance M Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Seymour
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 06/26 3:33 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Plaintiff Larry Seymour. (Coffman, Matthew James) |
|
Saturday, May 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
med
Notice Setting Mediation
Sat 05/13 12:37 PM
Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediator Terrance Miller to conduct Settlement Week Conference on 6/13/2017 at 03:00 PM. (sh) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Thu 05/04 5:11 PM
ORDER - This case is referred to the June 2017 Settlement Week. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 5/4/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Fri 04/21 2:49 PM
ORDER - Counsel to confer within five (5) business days and inform the Court via email by 5/1/2017 if case should not be set for June 2017 Settlement Week. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 4/21/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/15 1:29 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Magic Industries, Inc. (Burgett, Catherine) |
|
8 | 8
order
Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
Wed 03/15 11:19 AM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the JUNE 2017 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 5/9/2017. Primary Expert due by 7/21/2017. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/11/2017. Discovery due by 9/1/2017. Dispositive motions due by 10/5/2017. Settlement demand due by 5/9/2017 with responses due by 5/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 3/15/2017. (agm) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Fri 03/24 3:08 PM
Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/14/2017 before Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp. (jv) |
||
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Wed 03/01 2:29 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PARTIES by Defendant Magic Industries, Inc. (Burgett, Catherine) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 02/06 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference of the Parties set for 3/14/2017 @ 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp. (sh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 02/02 12:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Coffman, Matthew James) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 01/26 4:38 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to All Defendants. (Bryant, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/26 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E McNab for Defendant Magic Industries, Inc (McNab, Anne) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/26 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Frost Burgett for Defendant Magic Industries, Inc (Burgett, Catherine) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/20 5:12 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Magic Industries, Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5807556), filed by Larry Seymour. (Coffman, Matthew James) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |