United States of America v. Thomas
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas M Rose |
Referred: | Michael R Merz |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00020 |
Nature of Suit | 871 Federal Tax Suits - IRS-Third Party 26 USC 7609 |
Cause | 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 19, 2017 5:15 AM EDT |
Petitioner
United States of America
United States Attorney's Office 221 East 4th Street, Suite 400
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Respondent
John P Thomas
7300 New Carlisle Pike
Huber Heights, OH 45424 |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Tue 04/11 11:49 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Petitioner United States of America. (Koller, Kevin) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 04/11 9:30 AM
**COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT*** NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Petitioner United States of America (Koller, Kevin) Modified on 4/11/2017 (kpf) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 04/11 11:59 AM
Notation ORDER granting7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 4/11/2017. (kpf) |
||
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Fri 03/03 7:28 AM
ORDER - The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: Respondent shall fully comply and respond to the IRS summons to the United States satisfaction on or before the close of IRS business on April 3, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 3/2/2017. (kpf) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
minutes
Show Cause Hearing
Thu 03/02 11:15 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz: Show Cause Hearing held on 3/2/2017. Defendant appeared Pro See and the Government represented by AUSA Kevin Koller and IRS Agent Gwen Brenner. Defendant advises he provided the IRS agent with returns from 2009-2012 before the hearing. Defendant is still attempting to provide 2013-2015. The Court ordered Defendant to provide 2013-2015 to the IRS agent no later than April 2, 2017. If Defendant does not comply, the Government is to advise the Court and the Court will schedule a hearing. In the meantime, Government is to provide the Court with a proposed Order Enforcing Summons Compliance by April 2, 2017 at merz_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov in Word Format. (kpf) |
||
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Wed 03/01 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Kevin A Koller substituting for Nicholas J. Pantel as to Petitioner United States of America. (Koller, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 02/02 7:34 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: John P Thomas answer due 2/21/2017. (jmb) |
||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Wed 02/01 2:52 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Proof of Service Acknowledgment filed by Petitioner United States of America. (Pantel, Nicholas) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 01/23 8:40 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - It is hereby ORDERED that Respondent, JOHN P. THOMAS, appear before the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge in the United States Courthouse and Federal Building, 200 West Second Street, Dayton, Ohio 45402 on March 2, 2017, at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 4, to show cause why he should not be compelled to comply with the Internal Revenue Service Summons served on September 14, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 1/23/2017. (kpf) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Fri 01/20 2:18 PM
PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons , filed by United States of America. (Pantel, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Form Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Order to Show Cause |