MOBLIOUS, LLC
Arizona Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Madeleine C Wanslee |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-00599 |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 08, 2018 |
Debtor
MOBLIOUS, LLC
60 E Rio Salado Pkwy Ste 900
Tempe, AZ 85281-9126 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
DIANE M. MANN
P.O. BOX 12970
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85267 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003 |
Docket last updated: 01/21/2017 12:03 AM MST |
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment
Fri 01/20 4:56 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:17-bk-00599) [other,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 27904092. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
other
1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)
Fri 01/20 4:55 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 02/10/2017, filed by DAVID L. BROWN of Brown & Associates, PLLC on behalf of MOBLIOUS, LLC (BROWN, DAVID) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Fri 01/20 11:50 PM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 02/28/2017 at 08:30 AM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX). (Admin, Admin) |