8
|
|
8
misc
Letter
Fri 08/18 1:47 PM
Letter from plaintiff re conflict of interest. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
misc
Letter
Wed 08/16 8:24 AM
Letter from Plaintiff re conflict of interest. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/25 9:21 AM
NOTICE re ruling without jurisdiction by Steven Wayne Bonilla (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP
Thu 02/09 12:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Steven Wayne Bonilla. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Judgment
Wed 02/01 10:05 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/1/2017.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Certificate/Proof of Service
|
3
|
|
3
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 01/31 2:15 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/31/2017. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: IFP
Fri 01/20 1:50 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 2/27/2017. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/20 1:49 PM
COMPLAINT UNDER THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT 42 USC 1983, 1985, 1986; (NO PROCESS); (IFP PENDING); against Alameda County District Attorney's Office, Nancy E. O'Malley. Filed bySteven Wayne Bonilla.(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Envelope
|