17
|
|
17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 05/05 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Entire Action by Francisca Moralez (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
order
Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 04/13 11:42 AM
STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/25/2017 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 5/18/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/13/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/12 2:17 PM
NOTICE by Francisca Moralez of Settlement of Entire Action (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Tue 03/28 9:10 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Date for Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Lafayette Plaza Center, LLC, Peet's Operating Company, Inc.. (Burns, Michael) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
order
Order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/01 4:18 PM
ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/1/17.(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
|
12
|
|
12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Tue 02/28 2:36 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rxmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 02/28 9:05 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Francisca Moralez.. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 02/27 10:48 AM
CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (rxmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 02/24 9:02 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Date for Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Lafayette Plaza Center, LLC, Peet's Operating Company, Inc.. (Burns, Michael) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Wed 02/08 2:34 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge Consent/Declination due by 2/22/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (rm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 02/07 3:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisca Moralez. Lafayette Plaza Center, LLC served on 2/1/2017, answer due 2/22/2017. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 02/07 3:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisca Moralez. Peet's Operating Company, Inc. served on 1/30/2017, answer due 2/21/2017. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/23 11:02 AM
Summons Issued as to Lafayette Plaza Center, LLC, Peet's Operating Company, Inc.. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Mon 01/23 10:58 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 01/20 1:48 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/3/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 01/20 11:01 AM
Proposed Summons. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/20 10:57 AM
COMPLAINT ASSERTING DENIAL OF RIGHT OF ACCESS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, DAMAGES, ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS (ADA) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11089500.). Filed byFrancisca Moralez.(Best, Zachary) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|