Moralez v. Raley's et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Orrick |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00290 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 19, 2017 2:16 AM PDT |
Cross-claimant
Sand Creek Crossing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross-defendant
Raley's
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raley's
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sand Creek Crossing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francisca Moralez
4136 Amargosa Drive
Antioch, CA 94531 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Tue 08/22 4:53 PM
STIPULATION for dismissal of entire action filed by Francisca Moralez. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 8/22/2017) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 05/10 11:49 AM
Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 17 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Complete Joint Site Inspection. The deadline for the Parties to complete the joint site inspection is extended to July 20, 2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 05/08 1:15 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case extending deadline to complete joint site inspection filed by Francisca Moralez. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 5/8/2017) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Wed 03/15 8:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Raley's bySand Creek Crossing, LLC. (Allman, Sara) (Filed on 3/15/2017) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/10 3:26 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Raley's.. (Goulding, Lindsay) (Filed on 3/10/2017) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 02/27 2:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byRaley's. (Goulding, Lindsay) (Filed on 2/27/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 02/23 9:44 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Francisca Moralez re9 Order,, Case Assigned/Reassigned, (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 02/22 2:57 PM
STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME filed by Sand Creek Crossing, LLC. (Allman, Sara) (Filed on 2/22/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 02/21 4:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisca Moralez. Raley's served on 2/18/2017, answer due 3/13/2017. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 2/21/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 02/16 3:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisca Moralez. Sand Creek Crossing, LLC served on 1/31/2017, answer due 2/21/2017. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 2/16/2017) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 02/16 1:10 PM
ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/16/17.(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Tue 02/14 12:11 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 02/14 10:01 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Francisca Moralez.. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 02/07 10:28 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge Consent/Declination due by 2/21/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/23 4:18 PM
Summons Issued as to Raley's, Sand Creek Crossing, LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Mon 01/23 4:17 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 01/20 1:55 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/3/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 01/20 11:20 AM
Proposed Summons. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/20 11:18 AM
COMPLAINT ASSERTING DENIAL OF RIGHT OF ACCESS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, DAMAGES, ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS (ADA) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11089668.). Filed byFrancisca Moralez.(Best, Zachary) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |