Marten Stenfors v. Sodexo, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James Donato |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00294 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 19, 2017 2:20 AM PDT |
Defendant
Sodexo Operations, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sodexo, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marten Stenfors
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Sodexo S.A.
Terminated: 02/17/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
7
pgs
misc
Transcript
Fri 06/23 7:26 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/09/2017, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2017. (Aquilina, Rhonda) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
2
pgs
misc
Transcript Order
Fri 05/19 5:21 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/13/2017 before Hon. James Donato by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc., for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 5/19/2017) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 03/21 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul William Cane, Jr of Paul Hastings LLP - San Francisco Office (Cane, Paul) (Filed on 3/21/2017) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
minutes
Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Compel
Mon 03/13 2:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 3/9/2017.Granting 13 Motion to CompelTotal Time in Court 5 Minutes. Court Reporter Name Rhonda Aquilina. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/13/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
5
pgs
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Tue 02/21 5:21 PM
Declaration of Teresa Ellenburg in Support of24 Reply to Opposition/Response re Motion to Compel Arbitration filed bySodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 2/21/2017) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 6 pgs Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit F | ||
24 | 24
15
pgs
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Tue 02/21 5:15 PM
REPLY filed bySodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 2/21/2017) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 02/17 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Sodexo SA Only by Marten Stenfors (Barber, Stephan) (Filed on 2/17/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
13
pgs
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Tue 02/14 3:14 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byMarten Stenfors.(Barber, Stephan) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Marten Stenfors in Opposition | ||
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/31 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul William Cane, Jr (Cane, Paul) (Filed on 1/31/2017) |
|
20 | 20
2
pgs
oth_sup
Re-notice motion
Tue 01/31 2:26 PM
Renotice motion hearing re13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed bySodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 1/31/2017) |
|
19 | 19
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Tue 01/31 10:49 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2017.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/31/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017) |
|
utility
Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 02/01 8:45 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action . Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017) |
||
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 01/30 4:48 PM
Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/30/17.(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Fri 01/27 5:25 PM
Declaration of C. Christine Maloney in Support of13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed bySodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Att: 1 15 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 14 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 4 pgs Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 4 pgs Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 31 pgs Exhibit E | ||
16 | 16
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Fri 01/27 5:23 PM
Declaration of Reginald Stewart in Support of13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed bySodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A | ||
15 | 15
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Fri 01/27 5:21 PM
Declaration of Michael Rooney in Support of13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed bySodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Att: 1 11 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit B | ||
14 | 14
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Fri 01/27 5:19 PM
Declaration of Shoshana Y. Chazan in Support of13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed bySodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Att: 1 11 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit E | ||
13 | 13
19
pgs
motion
Compel
Fri 01/27 5:16 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 2/10/2017. Replies due by 2/17/2017.(Maloney, C.) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Fri 01/27 12:30 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/26 3:35 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc... (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/26 2:47 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marten Stenfors.. (Barber, Stephan) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Thu 01/26 2:45 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Marten Stenfors (Barber, Stephan) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/26 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephan A. Barber (Barber, Stephan) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 01/23 11:18 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2017 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
6 | 6
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Fri 01/20 2:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc. re Standing Orders (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 01/20 2:08 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/3/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Fri 01/20 1:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 01/20 12:43 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc. (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 01/20 12:40 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc. . (Maloney, C.) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 01/20 12:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-16-555821. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11090167). Filed bySodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc..(Maloney, C.) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D |