Andrews v. California Department of Consumer Affairs et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Orrick |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00252 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2017 1:18 AM PDT |
Defendant
California Bureau of Automotive Repair
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
California Department of Consumer Affairs
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
California Department of Motor Vehicles
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sonoma County Department of Child Support Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Louise Bayles Fightmaster
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kirk Gorman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kathy Simon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark T. Andrews
3436C Mendocino Ave
Santa Rosa, CA 95403 |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order of Recusal
Tue 04/18 10:27 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Donna M Ryu on 4/18/17. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (4/18/2017) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/14 11:39 AM
Summons Issued as to Louise Bayles Fightmaster, Kirk Gorman, Kathy Simon. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/14 10:39 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against California Bureau of Automotive Repair, California Department of Consumer Affairs, California Department of Motor Vehicles, Louise Bayles Fightmaster, Kirk Gorman, Kathy Simon, Sonoma County Department of Child Support Services. Filed byMark T. Andrews.(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 9:30 AM
Summons Issued as to California Bureau of Automotive Repair, California Department of Consumer Affairs, California Department of Motor Vehicles, Sonoma County Department of Child Support Services. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 02/27 3:06 PM
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 44611014060. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017) |
||
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 02/09 11:16 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark T. Andrews.(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 01/31 2:53 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge Consent/Declination due by 2/14/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 01/23 1:18 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and the filing fee of $400.00 shall be paid no later than 2/22/2017. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 01/20 11:45 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2017 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 01/20 11:41 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark T. Andrews. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/20 11:40 AM
COMPLAINT against California Bureau of Automotive Repair, California Department of Consumer Affairs, California Department of Motor Vehicles, Sonoma County Department of Child Support Services. Filed byMark T. Andrews. Consent/Declination due by 1/31/2017.(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |