Lion Share Investments, LLC v. Garcia
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00253 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2017 1:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
Pablo A. Garcia
3841 Saint Moritz Drive
Pittsburg, CA 94565 |
|
Plaintiff
Lion Share Investments, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Receipt
Tue 02/21 2:41 PM
Receipt from Contra Costa Superior Court Acknowledging Receipt of Remanded Documents. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Fri 02/10 9:19 AM
Clerk's Letter to Contra Costa County Superior Court re remanding case. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 02/09 1:32 PM
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Remanding case to Superior Court. Matter is REMANDED to the Contra Costa Superior Court. Court ORDERS that Defendant Pablo Garcia not repeat his removal of this unlawful detainer complaint. Further removals of the unlawful detainer complaint will constitute a violation of a court order.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/06 7:53 AM
NOTICE OF ELIGIBILITY FOR VIDEO RECORDING(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Relating Case
Fri 02/03 9:58 AM
ORDER RELATING CASES 16-cv-5731-YGR and 17-cv-00253-KAW. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/3/2017.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
order
~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned ~Util - Create Case Relationship
Mon 02/06 7:47 AM
Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Judge Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
||
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 02/06 12:37 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pablo A. Garcia.(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases
Tue 01/24 11:13 AM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re Lion Share Investments, LLC v. Garcia, 16-cv-05731-YGR. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/24/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 01/20 12:12 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Fri 01/20 12:11 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Resources Available to Pro Se Litigants. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 01/20 12:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lion Share Investments, LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 01/20 12:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa Superior Court. Their case number is RS 16-1034 Filed by Pablo A. Garcia. Consent/Declination due by 2/1/2017.(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |