Fields v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon S Tigar |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00272 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 18, 2017 2:39 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bank of New York Mellon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
|
|
Defendant
Bradley Real Estate
|
|
Defendant
Michael Busby
|
|
Defendant
Christine O'Brian
|
|
Plaintiff
Janeece Fields
7704 Washington Avenue
Sebastopol, CA 95472 |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
Thu 02/02 12:17 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 02/02 9:12 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Janeece Fields. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
8 | 8
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 02/01 3:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank of New York Mellon, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP re7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (McCullah, Tanya) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 02/01 2:49 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bank of New York Mellon, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP.. (McCullah, Tanya) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/31 4:06 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bank of New York Mellon, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC..(Biederman, Robert) (Filed on 1/31/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Fri 01/27 10:38 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge Consent/Declination due by 2/3/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss
Thu 01/26 4:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bank of New York Mellon, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 2/9/2017. Replies due by 2/16/2017.(Biederman, Robert) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Robert Biederman, | ||
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 to RJN, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 to RJN, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 to RJN, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4.1 to RJN, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4.2 to RJN, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 to RJN, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 6 to RJN, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 7 to RJN, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 8 to RJN, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 9 to RJN, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 10 to RJN, | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 15 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 01/20 8:21 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2017 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/2/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is SCV-259910. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11087184). Filed byBayview Loan Servicing, LLC, BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as TRUSTEE FOR CERTIFICATEHOLDERS.(McCullah, Tanya) (Filed on 1/19/2017) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Interested Parties, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibits |