Sides v. Cisco Systems, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Lucy H Koh |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00273 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 18, 2017 2:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
Cisco Systems, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Stephen Schrey
Mediator and Arbitrator P.O. Box 2671
San Francisco, CA 94126 |
|
Plaintiff
Kip Sides
177 Osage Avenue
Los Altos, CA 94022 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
57 | 57
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 10/24 12:26 PM
Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 56 Stipulation to Dismiss.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
56 | 56
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 10/23 2:57 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re dismissal filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Oliver, Linda) (Filed on 10/23/2017) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
55 | 55
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/20 7:32 PM
Order Rescinding 52 Permission to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/20/2017. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017) |
|
54 | 54
misc
Case Management Statement
Fri 10/20 11:03 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Errata to Case Management Statement filed by Kip Sides. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 10/20/2017) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
53 | 53
misc
Case Management Statement
Wed 10/18 9:04 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kip Sides. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 10/18/2017) |
|
52 | 52
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
Wed 10/18 5:40 PM
Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 51 Defendants' Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance.(iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017) |
|
51 | 51
motion
Appear by Telephone
Wed 10/18 4:29 PM
MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Oliver, Linda) (Filed on 10/18/2017) |
|
50 | 50
misc
Case Management Statement
Wed 10/18 4:28 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Oliver, Linda) (Filed on 10/18/2017) |