JGX, Inc. et al v. Handlery et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Referred: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00287 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 18, 2017 2:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Handlery
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Handlery Hotels, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sam Singer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Singer Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nick Bovis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bovis Foods, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JGX, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SMTM Technology, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, February 20, 2020 | ||
121 | 121
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 02/20 5:17 PM
120 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/20/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, February 19, 2020 | ||
120 | 120
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 02/19 4:30 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing All Claims With Prejudice filed by John Handlery, Handlery Hotels, Inc.. (Carr, Brandon) |