Barkley v. Capital One, National Association et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00297 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 47:227 Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 19, 2017 2:05 AM PDT |
Defendant
Capital One, National Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dawn Barkley
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Northland Group, Inc.
Terminated: 04/25/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 05/25 9:52 AM
ORDER GRANTING 25 STIPULATION DISMISSING DEFENDANT CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/25/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 05/25 8:34 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. filed by Dawn Barkley. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 5/25/2017) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Stipulation selecting Mediation
Tue 05/23 3:55 PM
ORDER GRANTING 23 STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/23/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation
Tue 05/23 1:31 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Capital One, National Association filed by Capital One, National Association. (Diaz, Chelsea) (Filed on 5/23/2017) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Tue 04/25 4:20 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Diaz, Chelsea) (Filed on 4/25/2017) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 04/25 8:54 AM
ORDER GRANTING 20 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT NORTHLAND GROUP, INC. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/25/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 04/24 4:47 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal of defendant Northland Group filed by Dawn Barkley. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 4/24/2017) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 04/14 12:44 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/01/2017. Case Management Conference set for 6/08/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Thu 04/13 4:11 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Northland Group, Inc. (Khalsa, Harijot) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/13 3:04 PM
ANSWER to Complaint byNorthland Group, Inc.. (Khalsa, Harijot) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/13 11:05 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 4/13/2017.(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
15 | 15
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Thu 04/13 9:26 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/12 1:42 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Capital One, National Association.. (Diaz, Chelsea) (Filed on 4/12/2017) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice
Tue 04/11 5:05 PM
ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 04/04 10:09 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/18/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/17 1:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Barkley. Northland Group, Inc. served on 2/10/2017, answer due 3/3/2017. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 3/17/2017) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 03/10 9:35 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Capital One, National Association (Diaz, Chelsea) (Filed on 3/10/2017) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/10 9:33 AM
ANSWER to Complaint byCapital One, National Association. (Diaz, Chelsea) (Filed on 3/10/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 02/09 2:01 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Capital One, National Association. (Diaz, Chelsea) (Filed on 2/9/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 01/25 6:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Barkley. Capital One, National Association served on 1/24/2017, answer due 2/14/2017. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 01/23 4:32 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dawn Barkley.. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/23 10:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Capital One, National Association, Northland Group, Inc.. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 01/23 10:25 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2017 10:00 AM at the US District Court, 280 S. First St., San Jose, CA 95113 in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/20/17. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 01/20 2:54 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/3/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 01/20 12:46 PM
Proposed Summons. (Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/20 12:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Capital One, National Association, Northland Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11090284.). Filed byDawn Barkley.(Gale, Elliot) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |