Karen Stromberg et al v. Qualcomm Incorporated
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Lucy H Koh |
Referred: | Virginia K Demarchi |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00304 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 19, 2017 2:18 AM PDT |
Defendant
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Roecker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Stromberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Galloway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle LaGrave
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Lammel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 04, 2022 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/04 11:46 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING LITIGATION by MDL Panel on 4/4/2022. (wsn, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/14 12:15 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for discovery proceedings. Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi no longer assigned to the case. (sp, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/08 2:02 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi for all further discovery proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 06/07/18. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Transcript
Mon 11/13 4:45 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on October 11, 2017, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2018. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 11/13/2017) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Transcript
Wed 11/08 12:30 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on November 6, 2017, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2018. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 11/8/2017) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Wed 04/26 3:28 PM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES; finding as moot (7) Administrative Motion to Relate by Judge Lucy H. Koh. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 04/17 4:38 PM
**CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this Notice, the 4/19/17 Initial CMC is HEREBY CONTINUED to 5/25/2017 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order
Thu 04/13 8:30 PM
ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference; Setting Schedule for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel and Consolidated Amended Complaint and Response. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/13/17. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 04/14 9:30 AM
Set/Reset Hearing Per ECF 72 , Initial Case Management Conference reset to 4/19/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order
Thu 04/06 1:12 PM
TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407, the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California are transferred to the Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. It is Further Ordered that transfer of the action listed on Schedule B is denied. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017) |
|
utility
Remark
Thu 04/06 3:03 PM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 5:17-md-2773 has been opened and assigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh. Documents relating to all actions should be filed in the master docket sheet and in the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed in the master docket sheet, and in the docket sheets for each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed in the master docket sheet and in the docket sheet of that action. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017) |
||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 03/30 9:59 AM
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting (65) Stipulation re: Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines in Related Cases.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Tue 03/21 10:47 AM
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting (56) Administrative Motion to Relate Cases.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/15 3:32 PM
NOTICE by Qualcomm Incorporated Notice of Firm Name and Email Address Change (Rizk, David) (Filed on 3/15/2017) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order
Mon 03/13 4:32 PM
ORDER Relating Crutcher, et al. v. Qualcomm, Inc., Case No. 17-CV-766. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/13/17. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Mon 03/13 10:32 AM
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting (54) Administrative Motion Relate Cases; granting (55) Administrative MotionRelate Cases. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order
Tue 02/28 4:26 PM
ORDER (AMENDED) RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/28/17. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Tue 02/28 10:11 AM
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting (49) Administrative Motion Relate CasesRelate Cases; granting (50) Administrative Motion Relate CasesRelate Cases; granting (51) Administrative Motion Relate Cases. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 02/15 5:40 PM
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 19 Stipulation to Extend Time for Qualcomm's Response to the Complaint.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Wed 02/15 5:38 PM
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting (46) Administrative Motion Relate Cases.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 02/15 4:38 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Filing Deadlines for Qualcomm's Response to the Complaint filed by Qualcomm Incorporated.(Rizk, David) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of David W. Rizk | ||
18 | 18
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Wed 02/15 4:31 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Qualcomm Incorporated (Rizk, David) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/15 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Wade Rizk (Rizk, David) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/15 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Justina Kahn Sessions (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/15 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Asim M. Bhansali (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/15 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Morris Paige (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/15 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Addy Van Nest (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Relate Case Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Wed 02/08 6:43 PM
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting (37) Motion to Relate Case; granting (44) Administrative Motion Relate Cases in case 5:17-cv-00220-LHK. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/07 3:47 PM
NOTICE by Mary Galloway, Danielle LaGrave, Thomas Lammel, Samuel Roecker, Karen Stromberg re1 Complaint, of Service Required on Attorney General Pursuant to AZ Rev Stat § 44-1415 (A) (2016) (Lewis, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/7/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 02/02 11:54 AM
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting (39) Motion for Extension of Time to Answer in case 5:17-cv-00220-LHK. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 02/02 8:32 AM
**CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES FOLLOWING RELATED CASE ORDER TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the related case order filed on 2/1/2017, the Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled for 4/19/2017 at 2:00 P.M. in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The Parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Relating Case
Thu 02/02 8:23 AM
ORDER RELATING CASES. 5:17-cv-00234-NC, 5:17-cv-00304-NC, 5:17-cv-00372-HRL, 5:17-cv-00398-HRL and 5:17-cv-00440-LHK are related to 5:17-cv-00220-LHK. Signed by Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 2/1/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 02/01 9:31 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings pursuant to Related Case Order. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibiity for Video Recording | ||
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 01/30 5:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Qualcomm Incorporated. Filed byKaren Stromberg, Samuel Roecker, Thomas Lammel, Mary Galloway, Danielle LaGrave. (Lewis, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/23 11:21 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 01/23 11:18 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2017 10:00 AM at the US District Court, 280 S. First St., San Jose, CA 95113 in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/20/17. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 01/23 7:12 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/3/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 01/20 4:15 PM
Proposed Summons. (Lewis, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/20 4:11 PM
COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF FEDERAL AND STATE ANTITRUST LAWS, STATE UNFAIR COMPETITION LAWS, AND THE COMMON LAW OF UNJUST ENTRICHMENT against Qualcomm Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11091951.). Filed byKaren Stromberg, Samuel Roecker.(Lewis, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |