Minnesota District Court
Judge:Donovan W Frank
Referred: David T Schultz
Case #: 0:17-cv-00206
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2017
Terminated:May 15, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Jul 22, 2017 4:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By
Daniel Keenan Ryan
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Margaret Ann Santos
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon Cole
Represented By
Brandon Operana
Operana Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, May 16, 2017
18 18 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Tue 11:47 AM
JUDGMENT(JDF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Monday, May 15, 2017
17 17 order Order Dismissing Case Mon 2:50 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/15/2017. (BJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2017
16 16 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipluation Fri 2:10 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re15 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Santos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 2:08 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Sharon Cole. (Santos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2017
14 14 order Order Thu 3:49 PM
ORDER that the May 22, 2017 pretrial scheduling conference is CANCELED. On or before May 24, 2017, the parties shall file their Stipulation of Dismissal and email a proposed Order regarding that Stipulation to District Judge Donovan W. Frank for his review and signature. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/27/17. (JDF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2017
13 13 order Order Thu 3:34 PM
AMENDED NOTICE AND ORDER OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference has been rescheduled to 5/22/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/20/2017.. (lmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Thursday, April 13, 2017
12 12 misc Rule 26(f) Report Thu 1:13 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Sharon Cole.(Santos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2017
11 11 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10:39 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz). Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/24/17.(AKL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Thursday, March 23, 2017
10 10 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Thu 2:51 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Connecticut General Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 2:48 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2017
8 8 notice Notice to Attorney - Case Reassigned to DTS Wed 11:50 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz, this case is reassigned to him. Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 17cv206 DWF/DTS . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Please contact Katie Haagenson 612-664-5460, for scheduling or other matters related to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (AKL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2017
7 7 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 2:12 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 02/21/2017. (MMG)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 20, 2017
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 11:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 1/24/2017, answer due 3/27/2017. (Santos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Mon 11:32 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5346970 by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2017
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 4:54 PM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (LPH)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Mon 4:53 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 17-cv-206 DWF/SER. (LPH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 4:47 PM
COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-5302945.) Filed by Sharon Cole. Filer requests summons issued. LTD Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A