Great American Duck Races Incorporated v. Kangaroo Manufacturing Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Roslyn O Silver |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00212 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 22, 2017 2:07 AM MST |
Counter Claimant
Kangaroo Manufacturing Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Yagoozon Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Great American Duck Races Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kangaroo Manufacturing Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Yagoozon Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Great American Duck Races Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
211 | 211
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Thu 11/21 12:19 PM
ORDER denying Defendants'201 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. See attachment for details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 11/21/19. (CLB) |