Bright Learning LLC
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Karen S Jennemann |
Case #: | 6:17-bk-00430 |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 24, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Feb 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Debtor
Bright Learning LLC
7300 Aloma Ave
Winter Park, FL 32792-7104 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Gene T Chambers
Post Office Box 533987
Orlando, FL 32853 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL7/13
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801 |
Docket last updated: 01/24/2017 12:03 PM EST |