Tara Retail Group, LLC
West Virginia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Paul M Black |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-00057 |
Case Filed: | Jan 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jan 27, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Tara Retail Group, LLC
PO Box 190
Bonita Springs, FL 34133-0190 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
2025 United States Courthouse 300 Virginia Street East
Charleston, WV 25301 |
Represented By
|
1. | Crossings Mall auction halted after bankruptcy filing on property announced (wvah.com) |
Submitted Wed 01/25/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 02/21 8:33 AM
Adversary Case Closed. (trs) |