McWilliams et al v. Classic Recreations LLC et al
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen P Friot |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00070 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 22, 2017 5:21 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Classic Recreations LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Jason Engel
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
CKMC Enterprises LTD
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Chalmer McWilliams
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Classic Recreations LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jason Engel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CKMC Enterprises LTD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chalmer McWilliams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 09/28 4:10 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice Jointly by All Parties by All Plaintiffs. (Brown, Bradley) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Administrative Closing Order
Mon 09/11 5:42 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to file any stipulation or dismissal, or to seek any order required to obtain a final determination of these proceedings based on the settlement. If parties have not filed any such document within 30 days for the purpose of dismissal pursuant to the settlement and compromise, this action shall be deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/11/2017. (llg) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 09/11 1:08 PM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by All Plaintiffs. (Brown, Bradley) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Protective Order
Wed 06/21 10:38 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 6/21/2017. (llg) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
minutes
Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Quash
Thu 06/15 10:39 AM
Minute Order. Proceedings held before Honorable Stephen P. Friot: Motion Hearing held on 6/15/2017.19 MOTION to Quash filed by Classic Recreations LLC, Jason Engel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as fully set out on the minute sheet. (Court Reporter Tracy Washbourne.) (llg) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 06/01 5:28 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Quash filed by Chalmer McWilliams.(Brown, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion
Fri 05/19 1:44 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing on19 Defendants' MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum : Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 305 before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Compliance with the subpoena is STAYED pending the hearing. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 5/19/2017. (llg) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Quash
Fri 05/19 10:49 AM
MOTION to Quash by All Defendants. (Gibson, Tom) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Subpoena
Tue 05/02 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Subpoena by Chalmer McWilliams(Brown, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/28 12:43 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 6/1/2017; Motions to amend due 6/1/2017; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 8/20/2017; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 21 days t/a; Pla witness list due 9/10/2017; Dft witness list due 14 days t/a; Pla exhibit list due 9/10/2017; Dft exhibit list due 14 days t/a; Motions in limine due 12/19/2017; Jury instructions & verdict forms due 12/19/2017; Voir dire requests due 12/19/2017; Trial briefs due 12/19/2017; Discovery due by 12/15/2017. Jury Trial set for 1/9/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 305 before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 10/1/2017. Pretrial Report due by 12/19/2017. Entered at the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 4/28/2017. (llg) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan
Tue 04/25 12:32 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs CKMC Enterprises LTD, Chalmer McWilliams. (Brown, Bradley) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Amended Counterclaim
Fri 04/21 11:41 AM
ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim by All Plaintiffs.(Brown, Bradley) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Counterclaim (Amended)
Wed 04/05 12:32 PM
FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by All Defendants.(Gibson, Tom) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Docket
Wed 04/05 11:36 AM
STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2017 10:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 4/25/2017. (llg) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim
Tue 04/04 5:24 PM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants.(Gibson, Tom) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 03/22 4:50 PM
ORDER denying9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 3/22/2017. (llg) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 03/14 12:42 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CKMC Enterprises LTD, Chalmer McWilliams. (Weger, James) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Tue 02/21 11:08 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Gibson, Tom) |
|
Monday, February 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 02/20 11:40 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Tom C Gibson on behalf of All Defendants (Gibson, Tom) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/03 3:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chalmer McWilliams, CKMC Enterprises LTD. Jason Engel served on 1/30/2017. (Brown, Bradley) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 01/30 11:17 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(Brown, Bradley) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Thu 01/26 3:14 PM
ORDER re1 Complaint filed by CKMC Enterprises LTD, Chalmer McWilliams. Plfs are DIRECTED to file an amended complaint, within 7 business days, which identifies all members of dft Classic Recreations LLC & the citizenship of those members. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of plfs' complaint & action w/o prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/26/2017. (llg) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 01/25 3:07 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Classic Recreations LLC, Jason Engel. (kr) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Entry of Appearance
Tue 01/24 2:48 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by James E Weger on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weger, James) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Entry of Appearance
Tue 01/24 2:46 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Bradley J Brown on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brown, Bradley) |
|
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Tue 01/24 2:28 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2427035. (Brown, Bradley) |
||
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/24 8:01 AM
COMPLAINT against Classic Recreations LLC, Jason Engel filed by Chalmer McWilliams, CKMC Enterprises LTD.(kr) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |