Doncaster LLC
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | K Rodney May |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-00554 |
Case Filed: | Jan 24, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 23, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Feb 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Debtor
Doncaster LLC
10901 Corporate Cir N
St Petersburg, FL 33716-3722 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Stephen L Meininger
707 North Franklin Street Suite 850
Tampa, FL 33602 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA7/13
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Docket last updated: 01/25/2017 12:04 PM EST |